Financial history YORK WAY MASJID AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1151255
Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2013 01/11/2014 01/11/2015 01/11/2016 01/11/2017
Total gross income £16.79k £54.49k £76.00k £32.40k £41.75k
Total expenditure £16.68k £49.99k £43.48k £56.75k £45.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0