Trustees KNOWLEDGE FOR CHANGE
Charity number: 1146911
Charity reporting is up to date (71 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Louise Ackers | Chair | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Allan Ndawula | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Melanie Stephens | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Claire Horder | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Ssekitoleko | Trustee | 11 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr John Chatwin | Trustee | 11 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr James Ackers-Johnson | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Chris Coey | Trustee | 13 January 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.