Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BRIGHTON, ST PETER

Charity number: 1146642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

27 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR BEN JACOB Chair 01 February 2012
4M UK
Received: On time
Martin Egede Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Charlie Coates Trustee 22 May 2023
SPEAR BRIGHTON TRUST
Received: On time
Indi-Anna Faithful Kent Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
James Stinson Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Angela Green Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Alison Jane Beal Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Anthony Clive Jones Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Teagan van Niekerk Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Stephen Neil Luke Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Katherine Millest Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Sunitha Susan John Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Sean-Barrie William Fiesal Jefferies Trustee 22 May 2023
None on record
Rev James William Henderson Roe Trustee 21 March 2023
None on record
Rev Daniel Millest Trustee 02 September 2022
SPEAR BRIGHTON TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WHITEHAWK
Received: On time
Rev Emily Roe Trustee 02 July 2022
None on record
Toluwa Oyeleye Trustee 26 April 2022
SPEAR BRIGHTON TRUST
Received: On time
Tom Alexander David Limebear Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Ayanfeoluwa Anne Egede Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Sarah Michele White Trustee 13 April 2021
None on record
Rev Hannah Milne Trustee 12 October 2020
None on record
John Sayers Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Rev Helen Louise Fontana Garratt Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
SAMANTHA ANN BREWER Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record
PAULA ANN TURTON Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record
MR CHRIS WILLIS Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record
Hanna Mary Fearon Turpin Trustee 01 February 2012
None on record