Accounts and annual returns RONNIE RICHARDS MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity number: 1146965
Charity reporting is overdue by 1475 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Overdue Overdue by 14 days
Annual return 31 July 2022
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022
Annual return 31 July 2021
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021
Annual return 31 July 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020
Annual return 31 July 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019