Accounts and annual returns BIRCOTES AND HARWORTH COLLIERY RECREATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1149308
Charity reporting is overdue by 215 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 215 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 215 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 October 2020 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 30 October 2020 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 15 February 2020 472 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 15 February 2020 472 days late Download Open in new window