LLOYD'S REGISTER FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1145988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £901.04m £908.17m £890.47m £916.28m £1.29bn
Total expenditure £893.94m £915.35m £898.97m £902.44m £1.33bn
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £2.83m
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £886.52m £887.49m £867.83m £892.85m £1.25bn
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £14.52m £20.68m £22.64m £23.43m £28.78m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £8.13m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £34.69m £23.52m £27.67m £16.45m £19.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.22m £1.07m £929.00k £925.00k £1.56m
Expenditure - Governance £108.00k £46.00k £48.00k £49.00k £65.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £34.58m £22.76m £23.86m £7.70m £5.08m
Expenditure - Investment management £1.22m £1.07m £929.00k £925.00k £1.56m
Expenditure - Other £858.03m £890.76m £870.37m £885.06m £1.31bn