SMITHSONIAN UK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1147674
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2015 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019
Total gross income £78.02k £36.61k £44.99k £147.36k £150.70k
Total expenditure £77.16k £34.20k £44.50k £89.52k £154.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A