Financial history SARVDESIC SATYA SAMAJ UK

Charity number: 1148754
Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 26/03/2018 26/03/2019 26/03/2020 26/03/2021 26/03/2022
Total gross income £11.73k £17.44k £1.30k £930 £841
Total expenditure £894 £12.96k £2.21k £1.30k £2.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A