HUNGARIAN VIZSLA WELFARE CHARITY

Charity number: 1147353
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
20/05/2016 20/05/2017 20/05/2018 20/05/2019 20/05/2020
Total gross income £43.78k £29.92k £30.66k £23.63k £24.14k
Total expenditure £35.88k £33.14k £34.80k £15.46k £35.96k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A