BOURNEMOUTH GATEWAY CLUB LIMITED

Charity number: 1147598
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £33.60k £42.39k £46.99k £53.46k £38.60k
Total expenditure £30.07k £40.35k £41.72k £44.59k £40.93k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A