Trustees ST. ANDREW'S CHURCH, BENTLEY

Charity number: 1147432
Charity reporting is up to date (175 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RIGHT REVD PAUL NIGEL HUNT BSC, MSC Chair 02 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
ST JUDE'S CHURCH, WALSALL
Overdue by 212 days
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: 26 days late
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CENTRAL TRUST
Received: 142 days late
Matthew Spiers Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
Elizabeth Garratt Trustee 01 March 2020
None on record
Daniel Michael Booth Trustee 01 March 2018
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: 26 days late
Eva Wildman Trustee 28 February 2017
None on record
Rev MARK ANDREW SPIERS Trustee 02 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND SOUTHERN DIOCESAN SYNOD
Received: 26 days late
PAUL REYNOLDS Trustee 02 April 2012
None on record
MARGARET THORLEY Trustee 02 April 2012
None on record
MR TED CRITCH Trustee 02 April 2012
None on record
JUNE GLADYS CRITCH Trustee 02 April 2012
None on record
MR MIKE BARLOW Trustee 02 April 2012
None on record
MRS DEANNE YARNALL Trustee 02 April 2012
FREE CHURCH OF ENGLAND CONVOCATION CHARITY
Received: On time