Governing document DOTEVERYONE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/07/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 09/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/02/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/04/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24 OCT 2017 as amended on 07 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF DIGITAL LITERACY AND THE USE AND APPLICATION OF DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY THE PROMOTION OF RESEARCH AND THE PUBLICATION OF USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITH REFERENCE TO: A) THE PROMOTION OF CITIZENSHIP THROUGH FACILITATING PARTICIPATION BY THE PUBLIC IN THE DEMOCRATIC PROCESS AND BY DEVELOPING THE BASIC DIGITAL SKILLS OF THE PUBLIC SO THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS ACTIVE AND RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS. B) THE EFFICIENCY OF PUBLIC SERVICES. 2) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENT PUBLIC ADMINISTRATION OF GOVERNMENT AND PUBLIC SERVICE, INCLUDING BY EDUCATING THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ART AND SCIENCE OF GOVERNMENT. 3) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY CHARITABLE AND NON-CHARITABLE BODIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR BY UNDERTAKING ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE DEVELOPMENT OF DIGITAL SKILLS AND SERVICES. 4) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AMONG THOSE WHO ARE EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY AND WHO LACK EITHER ACCESS TO ON-LINE SERVICES OR NECESSARY DIGITAL SKILLS. 5) TO RELIEVE UNEMPLOYMENT AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY BY PROMOTING FAIR AND EQUAL ACCESS AND JOB OPPORTUNITIES IN THE DIGITAL TECHNOLOGY INDUSTRY. 6) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT ENGLAND AND WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.