Accounts and annual returns ARISE AND SHINE CHILDRENS HOME KENYA

Charity number: 1147384
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 181 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Overdue Overdue by 181 days
Annual return 29 February 2020 28 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 10 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 12 December 2018 On time
Annual return 28 February 2017 29 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 29 November 2017 On time