Financial history C.D.P. (ST. HELENS) LTD.

Charity number: 1147286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £608.63k £669.30k £740.88k £714.88k £755.75k
Total expenditure £538.30k £643.02k £731.41k £728.93k £828.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £2.05k £2.00k £3.10k £11.02k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £606.63k £666.74k £738.36k £711.64k £729.19k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.00k £515 £523 £144 £495
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.04k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £185.04k £202.29k £731.41k £728.93k £828.30k
Expenditure - Raising funds £353.27k £440.74k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £202.29k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £15.04k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0