Governing document DOWNSIDE UP LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 2010 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/02/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/10/2013 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED ON 22 OCT 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 NOV 2020
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, BOTH WITHIN THE RUSSIAN FEDERATION AND ELSEWHERE: 3.1.1 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, 3.1.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE OF INDIVIDUALS WITH DOWN’S SYNDROME, 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON ACCOUNT OF THEM HAVING DOWN’S SYNDROME OR THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, AND ASSIST THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY THE PROVISION OF SERVICES, ADVICE, GUIDANCE AND INFORMATION AND BY RAISING AWARENESS OF ALL ASPECTS OF DOWN’S SYNDROME.?
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.