LONDON RECLAIMED

Charity number: 1148279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £316.05k £198.90k £298.28k £280.26k £357.08k
Total expenditure £195.28k £217.66k £277.70k £310.70k £354.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A