Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST FAITH'S LEE ON THE SOLENT
Charity number: 1150119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Dr Paul Chamberlain | Chair | 13 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev Michael Andreas Peter Moritz | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Erica Anne Wilkie | Trustee | 22 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annabel Brammall | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roland Jeremy Rogers | Trustee | 24 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Norman Olsen | Trustee | 04 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandy-Jane Fulton | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Roger Vann | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Joyce Dawson | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael James | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Commander MICHAEL SHRIVES MA | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLIFFORD ADRIAN ROOK | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Brian Mansbridge MNI MBE | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Luke William Marshall | Trustee | 30 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Dean | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.