Trustees Legal Response International
Charity number: 1147043
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jannis Bille | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alina Averchenkova | Trustee | 27 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Birsha Ohdedar | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jane Mwase-Vuma | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Seth Osafo | Trustee | 19 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Miller | Trustee | 10 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Matthew David Morton | Trustee | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOSS SAUNDERS | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD DYTON | Trustee | 27 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.