AL GILANI GHAUSIA CENTRE

Charity number: 1148027
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £16.07k £13.90k £18.71k £18.73k £19.12k
Total expenditure £15.95k £14.84k £15.54k £15.61k £15.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A