Trustees EBP SOUTH LTD
Charity number: 1146880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Kavanagh | Chair | 30 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Adam Lupton | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harry Gopal Kutty | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terry Buckel | Trustee | 24 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Bittlestone | Trustee | 31 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Heath Sammuel-Camps | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Aplin | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise MacDonald | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Jonathan Grant | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
BARRY LAMACRAFT | Trustee | 22 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER MARK ANDERS | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH ANNE CLARKE | Trustee | 19 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.