LONDON AZERBAIJANI COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1147533
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 October 2020 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 06 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 23 June 2017 143 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required