Accounts and annual returns AL MARKAZ AL ISLAAMI WOOD GREEN

Charity number: 1148850
Charity reporting is overdue by 1768 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 307 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 672 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 672 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1038 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1403 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1403 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1768 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1768 days