Trustees TWYFORD PLAYGROUP
Charity number: 1147226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandy Jane Adams | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Florence Bennett | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Aaron McLoughlin | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Simpson | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Felicity Anne Bowen | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebekeh Temple | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Thomas | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Gregory | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Thomas | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.