Trustees YOUNG CARERS DEVELOPMENT TRUST
Charity number: 1150197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Robert Cotton | Chair | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bernardo Dominguez | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Riley | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dione Hicks | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Pearce-Kearney | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Pierce | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PITT | Trustee | 22 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Katy Phillips | Trustee | 07 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Hutchison | Trustee | 31 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
William Feeny | Trustee | 21 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.