Governing document CAMBRIDGE HARMONY CHORUS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/05/2012 AS AMENDED ON 12/08/2013 as amended on 17 May 2018 as amended on 01 Jun 2018 as amended on 01 Jun 2018 as amended on 12 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
To advance, improve and maintain public education in and appreciation of the art and science of barbershop and 4 part close harmony singing in all its aspects particularly but not exclusively through: • the performance and presentation of singing; and • the provision of educational workshops for members of the public.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.