CRANBOURNE PRIMARY SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1147714
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £11.14k £11.74k £15.55k £15.25k £19.61k
Total expenditure £6.59k £18.85k £12.68k £20.23k £16.45k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £450 N/A