Governance 8PLASTICSPLUS
Charity number: 1149290
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 11 October 2012: Standard registration
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 27 October 2017: Re-registered
- 09 September 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 December 2018: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
- ACTION FOR COMMUNITY & ENVIRONMENT (ACE) (Working name)
- 8PLASTICS (Previous name)
- ACTION FOR COMMUNITY & ENVIRONMEN (ACE) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.