Financial history THE GLOBAL FUND FOR FORGOTTEN PEOPLE, ORDER OF MALTA

Charity number: 1148427
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £796.94k £1.24m £2.40m £2.59m £2.34m
Total expenditure £690.61k £908.81k £2.08m £2.63m £2.46m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £645.02k £1.13m £2.32m £2.53m £2.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £16.14k £19.34k £21.03k £17.51k £13.05k
Income - Other £135.79k £98.13k £60.67k £37.47k £24.66k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £596.81k £834.28k £1.96m £2.51m £2.37m
Expenditure - Raising funds £93.79k £74.53k £123.75k £118.31k £84.62k
Expenditure - Governance £61.33k £67.61k £90.03k £88.42k £125.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £330.90k £678.27k £1.67m £2.25m £2.05m
Expenditure - Investment management £10.67k £13.86k £9.94k £10.01k £11.15k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0