Trustees SHREWSBURY U3A
Charity number: 1148657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL REECE | Chair | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frank Velander | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Tanner | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Ford | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jan Dale | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Mutch | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Masterson | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cooke | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Don Burgess | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Coulthard-Jones | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Masterson | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Norman Jones | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alwyn Winter | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Keith Winter | Trustee | 15 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.