Financial history BIG PICTURE CHARITY FILMS

Charity number: 1148438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £40.85k £28.74k £39.58k £53.90k £13.96k
Total expenditure £25.90k £36.15k £35.68k £44.60k £32.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A