Accounts and annual returns THE MALAWI TRUST OF ST ELIZABETH

Charity number: 1154236
Charity reporting is overdue by 602 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 237 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 602 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 July 2020 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 July 2020 523 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required