CAAWIYE RELIEF

Charity number: 1149255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 February 2020 07 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2019 29 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2018 29 September 2019 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2017 27 September 2019 648 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 18 February 2016 27 September 2019 1013 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 February 2016 Not Required