Financial history VIVA ISLAM

Charity number: 1150377
Charity reporting is up to date (94 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £25.00k £53.67k £26.22k £24.98k £35.02k
Total expenditure £35.41k £47.97k £25.66k £21.58k £36.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A