GAY-GLOS

Charity number: 1149572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.88k £20.19k £24.97k £20.10k £20.12k
Total expenditure £18.08k £20.14k £21.41k £17.46k £18.49k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.50k £1.20k N/A N/A