Financial history WILD TEAM CONSERVATION

Charity number: 1149465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £186.71k £184.63k £120.60k £79.58k £117.98k
Total expenditure £189.92k £130.39k £176.63k £122.19k £163.01k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A