THE ROBINSON ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1151619
Charity reporting is overdue by 1511 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Overdue by 50 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 415 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Overdue by 415 days
Annual return 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 781 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Overdue Overdue by 781 days
Annual return 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1146 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1146 days
Annual return 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1511 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1511 days