Trustees STANDWITHUS UK
Charity number: 1151329
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOY WOLFE MBE | Chair | 30 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Rene Maxine Anisfeld | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Lyndon Marc Blair | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Lana Saffrin Betesh | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Bloom | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lady Hazel Cosgrove | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Perry Leslie Cash | Trustee | 15 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Loretta Cash | Trustee | 15 April 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.