BARNET AFRICAN CARIBBEAN ASSOCIATION LTD

Charity number: 1151068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £55.64k £56.21k £60.84k £44.00k £41.08k
Total expenditure £52.69k £51.27k £54.21k £46.16k £44.73k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A