Trustees UNIVERSITY OF WALES:TRINITY SAINT DAVID
Charity number: 1149535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Edge | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Elwen Evans KC | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Natalie Beard | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Roberts | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Kyle Glenn Erickson | Trustee | 07 March 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Emlyn Dole | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Timothy James Llewelyn | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Dr Peter Spring | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Taya-George Gibbons | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Emlyn Michele James Griffith Schiavone | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Justin Thomas Albert | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Uzoamaka Linda Owobi OBE | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Cornelia Sybille Matera-Rogers | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Kerry Anne Tudor | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Arwel Ellis Owen | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Geraint Roberts | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Rowland Jones | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Elizabeth Siberry | Trustee | 27 September 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.