ALUM ROCK ELDERS SUPPORT

Charity number: 1149343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £89.34k £89.23k £89.29k £94.46k £91.34k
Total expenditure £89.25k £89.18k £89.21k £94.28k £91.65k
Income from government contracts £2.17k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £43.87k £43.87k £43.87k £43.87k £21.93k