WAVE ADVENTURE

Charity number: 1152259
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 01/01/2017 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £25.15k £28.84k £71.87k £88.85k £140.89k
Total expenditure £22.65k £16.54k £67.10k £85.18k £105.65k
Income from government contracts £1.00k £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £16.00k £24.00k £3.00k