Financial history OXFORD WHEELS PROJECT

Charity number: 1149814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £161 £1.92k £6.74k £6.78k £6.21k
Total expenditure £18.23k £6.48k £4.47k £1.94k £2.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A