JESUS IS LORD EMBASSY, LONDON

Charity number: 1149521
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £26.18k £24.62k £22.58k £28.02k £41.64k
Total expenditure £22.07k £23.64k £28.57k £26.48k £38.43k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A