Financial history THE ORATORY OF ST PHILIP NERI AT MANCHESTER

Charity number: 1149954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £140.08k £120.61k £326.34k £127.64k £144.28k
Total expenditure £98.64k £126.08k £412.98k £151.72k £153.59k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A