Trustees WEALD OF KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT
Charity number: 1155413
Charity reporting is up to date (17 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
36 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV John David Ritson | Chair | 17 September 2014 |
|
|||||
Carol Ann Oakley | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Carol Barnett | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Hurst Ritson | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Alison Jane Farr | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Jean Ann Saggers | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Rodney James Stone | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ARCHER | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
GRACE ARCHER | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alan Ernest Spencer | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE WILKINS | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr Helen Patricia Richardson | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sharon LOVELOCK | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
Eileen Hayward | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|||||
HUGH EDWARD TAYLOR | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR PHIL SMITH | Trustee | 23 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SALLY ELIZABETH ANNE DAGNALL | Trustee | 17 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA IRENE BEVIS | Trustee | 20 January 2014 |
|
|||||
ROI JAMES ARDEN | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev JOHN MARK BUTT | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN SUAZNABAR | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN MARY LANGSTAFF | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
LEE ATHWAL | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
KENNETH JOHN BARNES | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER ALLAN CROUCH FCCA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Rev BRYAN THOMAS KNAPP BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
CHRIS TOWERS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
CARL ANDREW WARREN BA HONS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|||||
REV JOHN STUART CURNOW MA, BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN RICHARDSON | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR HENRY GEORGE EDWARDS | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev GERALD CHARLES GARDINER BA | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
REG RUMMERY | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE GWENDOLINE MANSER | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
STUART HUGHES | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL MARY SHEPPARD | Trustee | 10 January 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.