HUMANITY FIRST

Charity number: 1149693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.02m £756.79k £1.51m £1.21m £906.08k
Total expenditure £816.58k £612.06k £1.01m £931.55k £1.05m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £977.80k £723.68k £1.46m £1.18m £842.10k
Income - Other trading activities £41.79k £33.12k £40.51k £34.93k £63.98k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £701.34k £526.20k £851.14k £815.98k £943.15k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £85.86k £163.50k £115.58k £109.55k
Expenditure - Governance £33.52k £17.95k £20.57k £28.38k £18.21k
Expenditure - Grants institution £5.00k £250 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0