THE TRIMLEY STATION COMMUNITY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1151703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.37k £2.25k £3.54k £7.08k £2.42k
Total expenditure £4.78k £3.68k £2.19k £2.18k £2.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A