Trustees HORLEY LAWN TENNIS CLUB
Charity number: 1150481
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER HORDER | Chair | 06 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Clarke | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christine Eastmond | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry King | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sean Watson | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert James Wylie | Trustee | 14 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Cooper | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Richard FARRELL | Trustee | 15 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.