Trustees HADLEIGH UNITED REFORMED CHURCH
Charity number: 1151084
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Bryn Rickards | Chair | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Elmer | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Simon | Trustee | 31 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Swallow | Trustee | 29 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire Coster | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Apraku Mensah | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Robinson | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL CRISP BSC | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS GORDON | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAN DICKS | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
RONNIE HOWSON | Trustee | 24 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lambert | Trustee | 01 September 2010 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.