Trustees Glossop and Tameside Methodist Circuit
Charity number: 1150558
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
38 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Hazel Ann Cook | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Carol Sidebottom | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Veitch | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irene Rothery | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Mary Hewson | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Sidney Evans | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William John Tonkin | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine louise Balfour | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE GWYNETH HIRST | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
LILIAN CULLEN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
HELEN CHAUHAN | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
LINDA ANN OAKES | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Natalie Hackett | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Bernard Warin | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Anne Sidebottom | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Robert Andrew Balfour | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allen Gordon Flowers | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gill Hall | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA MELLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev GRAHAM TARN | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
MARGARET PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
ALAN REA | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Stuart Rolls | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Philip Antony Pache | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emmaline Saffron Krause | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jane Phillips | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Burgess | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LARRAINE JEAN HORROCKS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Robert John Davies | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
JUDY EVANS | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
ALAN MELLOR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
JEAN BLAIR | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Margaret Thorp | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Mason | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN CHARLTON | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY WANJOHI | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH MURPHY | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN MARGARET MASSEY | Trustee | 20 January 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.